Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
9810 W Portola Rd Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Tahsildoost Soheyl, against Metco Group Inc., Orojenilak Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Cycle Time287 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 9810 W Portola Rd, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 21, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LIEN
Date: November 21, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 21, 2019Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: November 21, 2019Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: February 19, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER
Date: February 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PETITIONER 9810 W. PORTOLA RD., LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FO...)
Date: February 20, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 02, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 22, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 17, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 22, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Personal Service Filed by 9810 W Portola Rd, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Order (Order) Filed by 9810 W Portola Rd, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Release Property-Mechanic's Lien (peti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 03, 2020Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 9810 W Portola Rd, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Petitioner 9810 W. Portola Rd., LLC's Ex Parte Application fo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by 9810 W Portola Rd, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Petitioner 9810 W. Portola Rd., LLC's Ex Parte Application fo...))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice (of Verified Petition for release of property from lien)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order (Order)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Release Property-Mechanic's Lien (peti...))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.