Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gonzalez Deborah, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Gerald Rosenberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Rosenberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: March 05, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 05, 2019Petition for Change of Name
Date: March 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 05, 2019Other - - OTHER - AMENDED PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME
Date: March 12, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: April 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: April 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Other - (Amended Petition for Change of Name)
Date: March 12, 2019Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: April 04, 2019Decree Changing Name Change of Name of Minor (by Guardian)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Other - (Amended Order to Show Cause)
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: April 12, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.