Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19PSCV00986 Hearing Date: February 16, 2021 Dept: J | |
February 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19PSCV00986 Hearing Date: February 16, 2021 Dept: J OSC DATE: Tuesday, February 16 , 2021 RE: JCWED Holdings Inc. v. Joma Logistics Inc. (19PSCV00986) ____________________________________... | |
February 06, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19PSCV00986 Hearing Date: February 06, 2021 Dept: J OSC DATE: Thursday, January 14, 2021 RE: JCWED Holdings Inc. v. Joma Logistics Inc. (19PSCV00986) _____________________________________... | |
January 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19PSCV00986 Hearing Date: January 14, 2021 Dept: J OSC DATE: Thursday, January 14, 2021 RE: JCWED Holdings Inc. v. Joma Logistics Inc. (19PSCV00986) ______________________________________... | |
October 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
OSC DATE: Wednesday, October 14, 2020 RE: JCWED Holdings Inc. v. Joma Logistics Inc. (19PSCV00986) ______________________________________________________________________________ Plaintiff JCWED Holdin...
Judge: Gloria White-Brown |
|
September 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
CMC DATE: Thursday, September 3, 2020 [No OSC set] RE: JCWED Holdings Inc. v. Joma Logistics Inc. (19PSCV00986) ______________________________________________________________________________ Plaintiff...
Judge: Gloria White-Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.