Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chen Mo, Feng Miaoli, Weng William Wei, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wong Fred A, against Cheng Sheng Le, Da Zhen Health Services Inc. A California Corporation, Da Zhen Travel Agency, Feng Miaoli, Weng William Wei, (total of 5) See All represented by Allison Michael, Jin Jewels Juhee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Gloria White-Brown presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management163 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff); As to: William Wei Weng (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiffs Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Jury Trial; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Court-Appointed Referee Tiffany Tso; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Miao Li Feng Erroneously Sued As Miaoli Feng (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Da Zhen Travel Agency (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of , Minute Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Order Re: Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: William Wei Weng (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 29, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: September 10, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: September 10, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 10, 2019Answer
Date: September 20, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: September 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 09, 2019Answer
Date: October 08, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 08, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 03, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 23, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: June 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2020Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: August 07, 2020Answer
Date: September 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 22, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION WITHDRAWN AND HEARING OFF-CALENDAR (RE HEARING 05 FEB 2021)
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 30, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE MOTION WITHDRAWN - HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: December 08, 2020Answer
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)
Date: December 15, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: December 15, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 01, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 01, 2021Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 01, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL
Date: October 04, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: November 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: December 01, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE [CCP S 639]
Date: December 30, 2021Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (CCP S 639))
Date: January 28, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION (AMENDED) OF MICHAEL ALLISON RE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL ALLISON RE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 08, 2022Order Appointing Referee
Date: February 09, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 11, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: July 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE / STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: October 26, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: December 07, 2022Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2022Order - ORDER RE: COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: January 26, 2023Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-COMPLAINT;)
Date: January 26, 2023Unknown - (AMENDED)
Date: January 26, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 13, 2023Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 13, 2023Answer
Date: April 12, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 18, 2023Brief - BRIEF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF
Date: June 05, 2023Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion Withdrawn and Hearing Off-Calendar (re Hearing 05 Feb 2021))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend to File First Amended Co...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order APPOINTING REFEREE (CCP s 639)))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Order (Appointing Referee [CCP s 639])
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion re: (Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Memorandum (Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration ((Amended) of Michael Allison re Proposed Order)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Allison re Proposed Order (No Attached Exhibit))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice (Motion Withdrawn - Hearing Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum (and Declaration of Michael Allison in Support of Motion for Order Appointing Referee)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER ADVANCING CRS-RESERVED HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Advancing Motion Fo...))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Referee
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend to File First Amended Co...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice (Motion Withdrawn - Hearing Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Motion re: (Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Memorandum (Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER ADVANCING CRS-RESERVED HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Order (Appointing Referee [CCP s 639])
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Advancing Motion Fo...))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Memorandum (and Declaration of Michael Allison in Support of Motion for Order Appointing Referee)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion Withdrawn and Hearing Off-Calendar (re Hearing 05 Feb 2021))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jewels Juhee Jin (Attorney)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Brief Mo Chen and Sheng Le Chengs Non-Confidential MSC Brief; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Brief Mo Chen and Sheng Le Chengs Exhibit G to Non-Confidential MSC Brief; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: William Wei Weng (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Referee Analysis;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 29, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Da Zhen Travel Agency (Defendant); As to: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Summary Adjudication: Filed By: Mo Chen (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff); As to: Miaoli Feng (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: William Wei Weng (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Mo Chen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.