Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blackfield Investment Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Pei Ke, Prc Restoration & Construction Inc. A California Ftb Suspended Corporation, Rodriguez Adelina, Rodriguez Christopher, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Avanessian Arpa, against Blackfield Investment Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Pei Ke, Prc Restoration & Construction Inc. A California Ftb Suspended Corporation, T & B Drywall An Unknown Business Entity, represented by Gardner Matthew Austin, Glocer Joshua Gary, Schiller Michael I., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Gloria White-Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGloria White-Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management150 days |
Filing DateJune 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Answer; Filed by: Blackfield Investment LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Michael I. Schiller (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jacob Rodriguez, et al. on
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Adelina Rodriguez, et al. on
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Blackfield Investment LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 21, 2019Complaint
Date: June 21, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 21, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 02, 2019Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: July 24, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 07, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 21, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: September 11, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 07, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 31, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE MEET AND CONFER
Date: November 07, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 07, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: November 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: November 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT KE PEI’S NOTICE OF MOTI...)
Date: November 26, 2019Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: November 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 04, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: December 06, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 30, 2020Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION
Date: January 31, 2020Answer
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 20, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: March 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020
Date: March 18, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: March 27, 2020Answer
Date: March 27, 2020Answer
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 22, 2020Notice of Lien
Date: October 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 20, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 16, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 21, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: November 12, 2021Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: November 16, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION 19(B)2 DECLARATION FOR ALIANA, JACOB AND MICHAEL RODRIGUEZ MINORS COMP
Date: December 02, 2021Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: January 10, 2022Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: January 31, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 06, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 06, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 06, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE MEET AND CONFER
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 16, 2021Answer Filed by Blackfield Investment LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANT KE PEI?S NOTICE OF MOTI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: May 17, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Hearing on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Blackfield Investment LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice (Of Release Of Lien) Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Michael I. Schiller (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Christopher Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Ke Pei (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Adelina Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANT KE PEI?S NOTICE OF MOTI...))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Release Of Lien)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (19(b)2 Declaration for Aliana, Jacob and Michael Rodriguez Minors Comp)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/12/2021)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re Meet and Confer)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re Meet and Confer)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.