Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schneitter, Hadia, Schneitter, Thomas, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Conservatorship of the Person The following must be submitted before the petition may be approved: 1) Capacity Declaration. No order adjudging that conservatee lack...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition: Appoint Conservator - Person and Estate
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal, Filed | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Investigator's Report, Filed | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Order During Court Closure, Filed | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
March 24, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Conservatorship of the Person IMPORTANT NOTICE: This posted note is for informational purposes to identify defects in the record that may be cured. No hearing will ...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.