Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Estate of Jarrett, Danny W
A Decedent's Estate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 30, 2023
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Decedent's Estate
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT
AND PETITION FOR FINAL
DISTRIBUTION, FOR ALLOWANCE
(OF COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEYS
FOR ORDINARY SERVICES
Date of Hearing: 1/12/2020
‘Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.
Department: Probate
or of the Estate of DANNY W. JARRETT,
ober 25, 2019, in Butte County, California, and
Will of Decedent has been found. Petitioner
f the Estate and Letters of Administration
were
all times since her appointmen t,
DEBRA
y qualified Administrator of the Decedent's
AGEL
Admisltatr and Potion fr Ws Seemeat
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Review Hearing
Date: Jul 13, 2021Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: May 19, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: May 19, 2021Receipt
Date: May 12, 2021Order
Date: Jan 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: Jan 12, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: Jan 12, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: Jan 12, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: Dec 18, 2020Accounting - Subsequent Petition
Date: Dec 18, 2020Satisfaction and Release of Creditors Claim
Date: Jun 02, 2020Inventory and Appraisal
Date: Apr 01, 2020Creditors Claim
Date: Feb 26, 2020Letters Issued
Date: Jan 07, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: Jan 07, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: Jan 07, 2020Minute Order
Date: Jan 07, 2020Order Appointing Administrator
Date: Jan 07, 2020Declaration
Date: Jan 06, 2020Petition to Administer Estate
Date: Dec 10, 2019Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: Dec 10, 2019Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: Dec 10, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Estate Share Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 19, 2021 |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
May 19, 2021 |
Proof of Mailing of Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Proof of Mailing |
||
May 12, 2021 |
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Estate Share Receipt |
||
January 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | The First and Final Account and Report is settled and approved. The matter is set for final discharge hearing on July 13, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the order submitted by counsel.
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and For Final Distribution, for Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and For Final Accounting Hearing First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and Petition for Its Settlement and Petition for Final Distribution, For Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and For Final Distribution, for Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Proof of Mailing |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The First and Final Account and Report is settled and approved. The matter is set for final discharge hearing on July 13, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the order submitted by counsel. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Creditor s Claim as to Comcast Cable Communication Review Hearing Re Final Distribution Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate Notice of Hearing |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and Petition for Its Settlement and Petition for Final Distribution, For Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Accounting - Subsequent Petition |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim of Comcast Cable Communications Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Creditor s Claim as to Comcast Cable Communication Creditor's Claim |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order for Probate and Letters Proof of Mailing |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Administrator
Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Petition will be granted upon filing of proof of publication. Bond is waived. Letters shall issue. Jane Dolan appointed Probate Referee. Final Distribution 1/12/21. |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Publication Declaration |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition to Administer Estate | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative |