Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peterson, Sarah, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Appointing Executor
Date: August 13, 2019Petition Hearing
Date: August 13, 2019Letters Issued
Date: August 13, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: February 13, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: April 12, 2022Review Hearing
Date: April 12, 2022Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: April 12, 2022Receipt
Date: March 27, 2020Review Hearing
Date: August 11, 2020Receipt on Distribution
Date: March 15, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Proposed Action
Date: August 21, 2019Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: July 24, 2019Review Hearing
Date: August 11, 2020Inventory and Appraisal
Date: December 11, 2019Receipt
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: January 21, 2020Receipt
Date: March 27, 2020Disclaimer
Date: October 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 11, 2020Status Report
Date: August 04, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: February 11, 2020Inventory and Appraisal
Date: December 11, 2019Receipt on Distribution
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Rescheduling
Date: August 11, 2020Notice of Proposed Action
Date: October 02, 2019Order
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 11, 2020Receipt on Distribution
Date: March 15, 2022Receipt
Date: March 27, 2020Receipt on Distribution
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Proposed Action
Date: September 09, 2019Will - Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Affidavit
Date: August 09, 2019Notice
Date: August 20, 2019Notice
Date: October 15, 2019Notice
Date: August 20, 2019Accounting - Subsequent Petition
Date: January 21, 2020Petition to Administer Estate
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: July 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court will hear from counsel regarding the filing of the ex parte request for final discharge.
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Re Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel regarding the filing of the ex parte request for final discharge. |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Final Distribution as to Carl Henry Herz Receipt on Distribution |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Final Distribution as to Brooke Mattique Colemen-Herz Receipt on Distribution |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Final Distribution as to Peter Fitzhugh Herz Receipt on Distribution |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Final Distribution as to Thomas Andrew Gustave Peterson Receipt on Distribution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.