Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hoagland, Kathleen, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition For Final Discharge And Order, Filed | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed on Waiver of Account on First & Final Report; Waiver of Statutory Compensation; Final Distribution -HRG: 8/20/20 |
|
August 20, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Waiver of Accounting; Final Distribution Approved, no appearance required.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Accounting on 1st & Final Report; Waiver of Statutory Compensation; Final Distribution Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG: 8/20/20 |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Filed of Compensation |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Accounting, Filed on First and Final Report; Waiver of Statutory Compensation; Final Distribution -HRG: 8/20/20 |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust, Filed -HRG: 8/20/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.