Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cervantes, Amelia, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review of Receipt & Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account No appearances required. Compliance achieved.
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Receipt & Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt & Acknwldmnt Order Deposit Money Blocked Acct,Filed | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt & Acknwldmnt Order Deposit Money Blocked Acct,Filed | |
October 15, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review of Receipt & Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account The following must be submitted: (Form MC-356) Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for ...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Receipt & Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Funds in a Blocked Account, Filed | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Compromising Claim of Minor, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.