Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st Accounting & Report of Conservator Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis, generally five days before the hearing. If no probate notes are poste...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
October 20, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st Accounting & Report of Conservator Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis. If no probate notes are posted, appearance is required. (Local Rule 1...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
February 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator’s 6-Month Review (Estate) The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The n...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
December 09, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Conservatorship Compliance Hearing Appearances required. The following must be submitted: 1) Proof of Recording Letters of Conservatorship (Prob. Code, § 2313) Proof of recordin...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
September 01, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator’s Annual Review No appearances required. It is recommended the Court find good cause to dispense with this review, because a review was just performed by the ...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
June 30, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Conservatorship of the Estate/ Court Investigator’s 6 Month Report Appearances are required. Dennis J. Lischka filed a declaration that contains objections to the c...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
March 24, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Conservatorship of the Estate/ Court Investigator’s 6 Month Report IMPORTANT NOTICE: This is for informational purposes to identify defects in the record that may b...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
January 21, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator 6 Month Review Appearances required. The following must be submitted before the Petition to Appoint Coservator of the Estate can be granted: 1) Proof of Servi...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
December 31, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator 6 Month Review It is recommended that the hearing be continued to January 21, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Appearances will be required on January 21, 2020, to discuss w...
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
|
October 01, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Conservatorship Compliance Hearing No appearances required. Compliance has been achieved.
Judge: Timothy Staffel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.