Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gibson, Jay A, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryTrust |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions609 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time613 days |
Order Dismissing Action
Date: September 25, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: May 28, 2019Petition Hearing
Date: March 12, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2019Petition Hearing
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2019Petn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code
Date: January 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Dismissing Action Proof of Mailing |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order Dismissing Action Petition Hearing Contest and Grounds in Opposition to Invalid Trust Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Hear Counsel This is related to another matter on calendar and they shall be heard together. |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Contest and Grounds in Opposition to Invalid Trust Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Hear Counsel 1. Status of service. 2. Status of entire case. |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Contest and Grounds in Opposition to Invalid Trust Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.