Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lee, John filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: January 11, 2019Petition to Administer Estate
Date: January 11, 20193-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access
Date: March 20, 2020Review Hearing
Date: February 11, 2020Request for Special Notice
Date: March 08, 2019Letters Issued
Date: February 08, 2019Petition Hearing
Date: February 05, 2019Order Appointing Executor
Date: February 08, 2019Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: January 11, 2019Request for Special Notice
Date: March 23, 2020Accounting Hearing
Date: June 02, 2020Opposition to Petition to Administer Estate
Date: March 24, 2020Accounting Hearing
Date: October 06, 2020Affidavit
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 05, 2019Creditor's Claim
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Rescheduling
Date: April 01, 2020Association of Counsel
Date: May 19, 2020Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: May 15, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 23, 2020Declaration
Date: January 06, 2020Inventory and Appraisal
Date: May 01, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: June 02, 2021Withdrawal
Date: March 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: March 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 17, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: June 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 02, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 06, 2020Accounting Hearing
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Returned Documents
Date: February 26, 2019Will - Filed
Date: February 08, 2019Declaration
Date: August 24, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: August 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 31, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: August 31, 2021Order
Date: September 07, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: February 17, 2022Review Hearing
Date: March 01, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration
Date: March 16, 2020Accounting Hearing
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: February 23, 2021Report
Date: January 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2021Notice
Date: August 18, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 27, 2021Order
Date: June 02, 2021Accounting Hearing
Date: April 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 23, 2021Receipt
Date: February 14, 2022Receipt
Date: February 14, 2022Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: February 16, 2022Receipt
Date: February 14, 2022Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution
Date: March 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 17, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 16, 2022 |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
February 14, 2022 |
Receipt by Nicole Plottel Receipt |
||
February 14, 2022 |
Receipt by Robert D. Harp Receipt |
||
February 14, 2022 |
Receipt by Mark K. Deleo Receipt |
||
September 30, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
September 07, 2021 |
Order Granting First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Petition for Final Distribution Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
August 31, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court has received and reviewed the Supplement to First and Final Account and Report of Executor, including the Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release. The Court approves the Settlement Agreement...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.