Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seregina Natalia, Seregin Eugeni, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Pinchuk Anatoly, Pinchuk Tamara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Annabelle G. Cortez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: April 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: April 22, 2019Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement
Date: May 21, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: May 21, 2019Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Natalia Seregina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/22/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Eugeni Seregin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.