Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro Aaron N., against Mckinney Princess, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ann H. Park presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time233 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 16, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 16, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 21, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: July 07, 2020Judgment - Judgment Judgment
Date: July 08, 2020Order (name extension) - Order to Vacate Default Judgment
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: PRINCESS MCKINNEY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Declaration of Aaron Baldaro; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: August 05, 2020Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.