Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pinheiro Carolina, against Lopez Victor, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Complaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LOPEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LOPEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION PURSUANT CCP 1033; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Default entered as to VICTOR LOPEZ; On the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service
Date: December 23, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Date: December 31, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: June 16, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION PURSUANT CCP 1033
Date: June 23, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 23, 2021Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: June 28, 2021Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (riverside)
Date: September 17, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return (County of Riverside)
Date: January 17, 2023Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LOPEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/16/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LOPEZ (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.