Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Bicycle Casino A Partnership, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stark Jerome, against Xu Shuyu An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 07, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 07, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 07, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: January 02, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Advancing and Continuing OSC hearing)
Date: June 12, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: August 25, 2020Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: August 25, 2020Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
Date: November 12, 2021Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: November 12, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.