Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mukai Jeffery K, against Vong David, represented by Gabra Noha, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Andrew C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew C. Kim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of David Vong
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: October 21, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 14, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: October 30, 2020Separate Statement - Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO MSJ
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Hanna Kerfan Esq
Date: February 08, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 08, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of plaintiff's qualified witness list ISO MSJ
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail re: MSJ
Date: February 08, 2021Separate Statement - Separate Statement
Date: April 22, 2021Reply (name extension) - Reply to Defendant's Opposition
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: May 07, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing
Date: July 23, 2021Answer; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration of Hanna Kerfan Esq; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration of plaintiff's qualified witness list ISO MSJ; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of David Vong; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Proposed Order and Judgment; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO MSJ; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Proposed Order and Judgment; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of Hanna Kerfan Esq; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Declaration of plaintiff's qualified witness list ISO MSJ; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of David Vong; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: DAVID VONG (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO MSJ; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.