Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bh Financial Group Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian John P., against Cubias Zeus Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Cycle Time325 days |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 24, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 31, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: May 04, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 22, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION IN RE: C.C.P 1033
Date: June 22, 2020Order (name extension) - Order ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 22, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: June 24, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES )
Date: December 08, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: June 21, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order
Date: August 30, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.