Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Partners Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Garwacki Jr. Ray, against Ramirez Crystal Lynn Aka Crystal L. Ramirez An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Andrew C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2019 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Declaration re: Accrued Interest; Filed by: PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)
Date: February 26, 2021Default entered as to Crystal Lynn Ramirez; On the Complaint filed by PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Lynn Ramirez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: May 14, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: May 14, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order- Matter is not called for a hearing.)
Date: April 10, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: June 29, 2020Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: October 15, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest
Date: February 26, 2021Complaint; Filed by: PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Lynn Ramirez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.