Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert Scott, against Cetina Adela, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Sheryl M. Beasley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Default entered as to Adela Cetina; On the Complaint filed by Barclays Bank Delaware on
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION 1033; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: April 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 04, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: April 04, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: April 30, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 30, 2019Declaration of Mailing - Declaration of Mailing
Date: April 30, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION 1033
Date: June 26, 2019Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case
Date: June 26, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 26, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: June 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Cetina (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION 1033; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Default entered as to Adela Cetina; On the Complaint filed by Barclays Bank Delaware on 04/04/2019
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.