Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
La Financial Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anaya Alana B, against Swift Judith A Aka Judith Ann Chaparro, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Andrew C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions210 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Cycle Time566 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Default entered as to JUDITH A SWIFT; On the Complaint filed by LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION on
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Default entered as to JUDITH A SWIFT; On the Complaint filed by LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION on
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH A SWIFT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH A SWIFT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 31, 2019Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: June 24, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: January 31, 2019Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish
Date: June 20, 2019Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: July 22, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 29, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 13, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: September 13, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: August 19, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Publication; Filed by: LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH A SWIFT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH A SWIFT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Default entered as to JUDITH A SWIFT; On the Complaint filed by LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION on 01/31/2019
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Default entered as to JUDITH A SWIFT; On the Complaint filed by LA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION on 01/31/2019
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.