Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Owens James David Jr, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hall Tony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen V. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only Judge: Maria |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cawelti, Stephen, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Stephen |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Reissue Temporary Restraining Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued Judge: Maria |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (CH-109,CH-110 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.