Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flores Arcelia, Flores Ruben, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Alemozaffar Motlagh Nilufar, against Martin Jose Luis, Rojas Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Inglewood with Ronald F. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseInglewood |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 18, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: April 18, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: April 18, 2019Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: April 22, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Ruling and Notice of Trial
Date: May 21, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: May 22, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 12, 2019Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: June 12, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution
Date: June 24, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/12/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MELISSA OSORIO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.