Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bergman, Madison Kiyomi, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hartley, Lukas, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Restaining Order After Hearing Served on the Respondent | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 01-15-23
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order; 12/31/2019 Temporary Orders Granted -Restraining Order Granted in Juvenile case on 01/03/20 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service to Respondent Regarding Notice of Hearing, Request for Restraining Order and Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.