Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedJune 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Further Proceedings
Date: July 08, 2019Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 11, 2019Further Proceedings
Date: July 30, 2019Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: November 05, 2020Request for Order: Modification
Date: November 20, 2020Further Proceedings
Date: December 03, 2020Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 05, 2021Court Trial: Short Cause
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Court Trial: Short Cause Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Court Trial: Short Cause Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Trial Setting Conference Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Court Hearing | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | At Issue Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.