Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shaver, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: February 06, 2019Further Proceedings
Date: March 27, 2019Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: February 27, 2019Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Date: February 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing Order on Request to Continue Hearing Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.