Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ganahl, Christopher David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ganahl, Alexandra, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/27/2020 Request - Enter Default
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 10/29/2020
Date: October 29, 2020SUMMONS 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2019 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 07/07/2020
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 07/24/2020 Proof Of Service - Personal
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/02/2020
Date: November 02, 2020NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/28/2021
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 01/20/2021 Notice - Limited Scope Respresentation
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 01/20/2021
Date: January 20, 2021DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/29/2020 PRELIM/ FINAL
Date: October 29, 2020MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 11/02/2020
Date: November 02, 2020MINUTE ORDER 01/22/2021
Date: January 22, 2021JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 01/22/2021
Date: January 22, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.