Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lizano, Melissa Lorena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manriquez, Omar, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions270 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time270 days |
RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/03/2019
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/22/2019
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 03/22/2019 Guide & File - FL-160 Property Declaration-Com
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/22/2019
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/22/2019 Guide & File - FL-100 Petition
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 03/22/2019 Guide & File - L-1120 Family Law Notice Re Rel
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00SUMMONS 03/22/2019 Guide & File - FL-110 Summons
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/30/2019
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/22/2019 Guide & File - FL-150 Income and Expense Decla
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 03/22/2019 Guide & File - FL-160 Property Declaration-Sep
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 03/28/2019
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/07/2019
Date: October 07, 2019RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 08/30/2019
Date: August 30, 2019RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/19/2019
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 10/30/2019
Date: October 30, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/09/2019 SERVICE ON AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 09, 2019DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/24/2019
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 07/12/2019
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 09/30/2019
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/17/2019
Date: December 17, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/24/2019 AMENDED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00PETITION - AMENDED 08/05/2019
Date: August 05, 2019DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/13/2019
Date: November 13, 2019SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 08/05/2019
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/17/2019
Date: December 17, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.