Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Luis Obispo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (sued as “Cal Fire”),1 and the Coun...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
January 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (sued as “Cal Fire”), and the Count...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
January 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff’s Request for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint Date: January 19, 2021 (continued from 11/10/20) TENTATIVE RULING William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, agai...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
March 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (sued as “Cal Fire”), and the County of San Luis Obi...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
March 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Leave to file Late Claim Motion for Discovery Case Management Conference “On its own motion, the Court is continuing all pending motions and the Case Management Conference from March 3, 202...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
February 25, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (sued as “Cal Fire”), and the County of San Luis Obi...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
January 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (sued as “Cal Fire”), and the County of San Luis Obi...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
November 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
San Luis Obispo County’s Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on June 17, 2019, against David Macagni (“Macagni”), the Department of Forestry and Fir...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
|
August 06, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
William Carlyle (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against David Macagni, Cal Fire, and the County of San Luis Obispo (the “County”). The action was filed on June 17, 2019. The dispute arises from damage...
Judge: Linda D. Hurst |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.