Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anthony R Castillo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by David W. Scopp, against Richard Castillo, represented by Barbara Hehir Olsen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is filed by Anthony R. Castillo, a minor, through his Guardian ad Litem, against Richard Castillo and Does 1 through 20. The complaint alleges three causes of action: strict liability under Civil Code section 3342, strict liability und...
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 31, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: February 06, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: September 15, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint: atty Olsen |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.