Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lina M Michael, against Brahim Yousfi, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 05, 2020Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: January 14, 2021Conference: Case Management
Date: August 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing: Dismissal after settlement | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Paul Eum Re: Late Filing of CMC Statement. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.