Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harijot S Khalsa, against On Press, Inc., A Corporation, Scott Schutzer, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 27, 2019Notice: Settlement
Date: February 05, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2020Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.