Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Guzik Technical Enterprises, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Abraham Aleem Tabaie, Allen J. Ruby, against Keysight Technologies, Inc., represented by Brett M. Schuman, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Guzik Technical Enterprises against Keysight Technologies, Inc. The complaint alleges that Keysight engaged in a scheme to steal a valuable business opportunity from Guzik and restrict its ability to compete. Keysight used ...
Order: Submitted Matter
Date: March 05, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: February 13, 2024Order
Date: March 28, 2024Motion: Seal
Date: February 28, 2024Notice: Settlement
Date: March 07, 2024Errata
Date: February 13, 2024Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: March 21, 2024Response/Reply
Date: February 13, 2024Proof of Service
Date: March 20, 2024Proof of Service
Date: February 28, 2024Proof of Service
Date: March 28, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: March 14, 2024Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: March 21, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: February 28, 2024Response/Reply
Date: March 20, 2024Stipulation
Date: March 07, 2024Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 13, 2024Motion: Seal
Date: February 09, 2024Minute Order
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: February 09, 2024Conference: Case Management
Date: July 17, 2020Motion: Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: September 23, 2020Response/Reply
Date: February 09, 2024Exhibit List (Party)
Date: February 09, 2024Response/Reply
Date: February 09, 2024Response/Reply
Date: February 09, 2024Objection: Evidence
Date: February 09, 2024Notice
Date: February 09, 2024Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 30, 2019Motion: Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: September 18, 2020Order
Date: December 24, 2019Order
Date: July 22, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: August 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2020Demurrer
Date: August 17, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 13, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 10, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 17, 2020Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: October 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order HRG 3/27/24 Order Granting KEYSIGHT's Motion to Seal - signed/TCZ. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed HRG 3/27/24 PROPOSED Order Granting KEYSIGHT's Motion to Seal |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Entire Action Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply 3-27-24 1:30pm dept.19 Reply |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections PLAINTIFF GUZIK TECHNICAL ENTERPRISES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KEYSIGHT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S MOTION TOSEAL EXHIBITS LODGED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO KEYSIGHTS MOTION FOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.