Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jeremy Rovinske filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 18, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: December 17, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: June 18, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: August 18, 2020Response/Reply
Date: June 11, 2020Hearing: Motion hearings
Date: August 11, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: January 14, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: June 18, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: July 29, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: January 24, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: June 23, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 04, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: May 18, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 11, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 08, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: January 24, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 20, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: August 11, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: May 18, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: May 15, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 18, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 17, 2019Motion: Other
Date: May 18, 2020Demurrer
Date: January 24, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 04, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: December 12, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 12, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: January 15, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 24, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: February 25, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 20, 2020Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: June 24, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: June 08, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter DENIED- hrg: 08/11/20; 9AM; D6-- Re: Disqualification of Hopkins & Carley Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore Apporinted Reporter Janet m. Wood, CSR, 8/11/2020 for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore: Signed by Judge Folan, Dept. 6. EFS 8/10/20rb Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse and Disqualify Hopkins & Carley as Counsel |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Jeremy Rovinske's Motion to Recuse and Disqualify Hopkins & Carley as Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.