Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Lazaro Correa, Matern Law Group, Pc, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Matthew John Matern, Mikael Hans Stahle, Michael R Crosner, Rex John Phillips, William L. Marder, (total of 6) See All against Il Fornaio, represented by Hope Anne Case, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Lazaro Correa against Il Fornaio (America) Corporation and other defendants. Lazaro Correa, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, alleges various violations of California labor laws by t...
Request
Date: September 13, 2022Notice
Date: September 19, 2022Declaration
Date: September 15, 2023Minute Order
Date: August 23, 2023Stipulation and Order
Date: October 15, 2021Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: September 26, 2023Order
Date: June 23, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2022Notice
Date: January 14, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: March 01, 2022Notice
Date: January 19, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: June 22, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 15, 2023Proof of Service
Date: June 22, 2023Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 18, 2023Substitution: Attorney
Date: October 04, 2022Order
Date: January 18, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 14, 2023Notice
Date: October 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: January 14, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: January 14, 2022Notice
Date: June 25, 2021Notice
Date: May 16, 2022Notice
Date: August 24, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 16, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 15, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 12, 2023Notice
Date: April 18, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 15, 2023Stipulation and Order
Date: June 18, 2021Conference: Case Management
Date: November 22, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: February 14, 2020Conference: Case Progress
Date: May 28, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: June 26, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: July 10, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: July 31, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: August 21, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 14, 2022Proof of Service
Date: June 17, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 02, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: January 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 27, 2020Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: February 06, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: May 08, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: May 08, 2020Order
Date: July 10, 2020Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: August 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 10, 2020Order
Date: July 31, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 13, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: May 13, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 05, 2021Notice
Date: April 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 26, 2021Order: Submitted Matter
Date: December 21, 2020Notice
Date: January 13, 2021Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 01, 2021Notice: Entry of Order
Date: November 12, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 03, 2021Order: Proposed
Date: June 19, 2020Response/Reply
Date: June 25, 2020Brief
Date: July 24, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 15, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 22, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: October 23, 2019Brief
Date: August 10, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: January 07, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 25, 2020Brief
Date: July 24, 2020Order
Date: December 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: June 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Entire Action Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice; Proof of Service |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration HRG 10/4/23 Julia Z. Wells Declaration ISO Joint Status Report |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 10/4/23 Joint Status Report |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Further CMC set for 10/4/23 at 2:30pm in D19 |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 8/23/23 Case Management Statement |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Dismissal of their Individual Claims With Prejudice and their Class and Representative PAGA Claims Without Prejudice - signed/TCZ. | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Samantha A. Smith Declaration ISO Plaintiffs' Request for Dismissal |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.