Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Colliers International, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Todd Andrew Roberts, against Gabriel E. Arechaederra, represented by Candice P Shih, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is filed by Colliers International, Inc. against Gabriel E. Arechaederra for breach of contract and money had and received. Colliers International, Inc. is the successor and assignee of Colliers Parrish International, Inc. (CPY). Arech...
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 26, 2020Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: August 27, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 30, 2021Notice: Entry of Order
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 02, 2021Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: June 10, 2021Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: January 10, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: January 07, 2022Conference: Case Management
Date: October 29, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 18, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: July 14, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: November 10, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 20, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 03, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 16, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: July 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 03, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: July 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Protective Order. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter #7118276 Stipulation and Order/POS- Proposed Order Cover Sheet (EFS-020) needs to be attached to the Stipulation and Order. |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Change of Address |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.