Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elizabeth Mary Pope, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Louis S. Abronson, against Kan Morgan, represented by John Philip Sciacca, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 15, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: July 31, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: June 22, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: June 22, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 29, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 22, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 21, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 31, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 07, 2020Review: Mediation Status
Date: November 12, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 15, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 16, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: July 16, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: September 10, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing | Motion: Compel | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel Oral Deposition of PMK and Compliance with Subpoena, Atty Turville, TBD, D21 Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 16, 2020 | Hearing | Review: Mediation Status | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel HRG: 9/15/20, 9am, D21; Atty:Turville - Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena re: Kaiser Redwood City Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.