Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Champion Daniel Muthle, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Menorca Millenials, S.L, represented by Richard Casey Hannegan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThang Nguyen Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time249 days |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 30, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2020Order
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 01, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2019OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: October 31, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: November 12, 2019Motion: Quash
Date: January 09, 2020Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: September 30, 2019Order
Date: February 03, 2020Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: January 30, 2020Motion: Quash
Date: September 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order It is the Order of this Court this case is dismissed without prejudice as to entire case due to no appearance by Plt Judge Barrett |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail re: Order of Dismissal |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Mtn. to Quash Service of Summons |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Quash
Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support RE: Default |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Motion to quash filed on 9/18/19. |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.