Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grace Gail Cara, against Mohammad Harandi, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 22, 2019 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time323 days |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 22, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: September 09, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: August 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 02, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 30, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: September 09, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 10, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: September 09, 2019Memorandum
Date: September 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment: Default | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Request: Judicial Notice | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support RE: CCP 1788 |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Does only |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (e-served 11/22/19 #3687360) Judge: Carol W. Overton |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Of Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.