Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David Meinhardt, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited (02) case against City Of Sunnyvale, Sunnyvale Personnel Board, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2019 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited (02) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 11, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 11, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: August 06, 2020Appeal: Notice of Completion
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 11, 2020Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
Date: September 22, 2020Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
Date: October 20, 2020Deposit: Clerk's Transcript
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2020Proof of Service: Mail
Date: October 03, 2019Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: May 10, 2019Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: May 10, 2019Response/Reply
Date: April 10, 2020Motion: Other
Date: March 11, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 18, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 14, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: March 04, 2020Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)
Date: May 03, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: April 01, 2020Hearing: Petition Writ of Mandate
Date: May 28, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Appeal: Notice of Completion | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Deposit: Clerk's Transcript H048540 |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal 8.124 (UN) Rule 8.124 H048540 |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Signed by Judge Kirwan |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Judgment: Notice of Entry Civil |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus is Denied by Judge Kirwan |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.