Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Joel Garcia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Omar Issa Habbas, against Jennifer Ann Hinger, Lisa Cole, represented by Emily A Mahoney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time144 days |
Request: Dismissal
Date: August 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 02, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: July 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 20, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 25, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal entire with prejudice by atty Atterbury |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Theodore C. Zayner |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice re: of Change of Handling Attorney |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to Complaint, atty Mahoney |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 PAID |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration: Re: Diligence | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.