Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leonardo Gonzalez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David Neal Barry, against Fca Us, Llc, Normandin Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Normandin'S, represented by Jon David Universal, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 01, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 01, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: February 13, 2020Response/Reply
Date: March 19, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: March 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 03, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 01, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: March 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 23, 2019Hearing: Motion hearings
Date: July 14, 2020Review: Mediation Status
Date: August 13, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 12, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 12, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 31, 2019Notice: Settlement
Date: July 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2019Notice: Ruling
Date: February 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
March 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Reply Brief in Support of Fee Motion |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Plaintiff's Objection to the Declaration of Adam Khan |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Hrg 03/26/20 - to Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Hrg 03/26/20 - of AGK ISO Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Attorney's Fees Hrg 03/26/20 @ 9am D20 Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.