Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Christopher Doerhoff, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Joseph John Babich, against Brightview Tree Care Services, Inc., represented by Mark Alan Bates, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited (35) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 23, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: January 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 07, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: January 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 04, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: June 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 11, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: April 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 01, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: August 13, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 19, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 21, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 10, 2019Stipulation and Order: ADR
Date: March 09, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: January 12, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 25, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 16, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Hearing | Conference: Trial Setting | |
August 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order: ADR | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Plaintiff's Case Management Statement |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) to complaint, atty Bates |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.