Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
City of Santa Clara vs D.E. II Restaurants, Inc.
On January 02, 2019 an eminent domain/inv cond unlimited (14) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. Judge Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2023
Filing Location
Santa Clara County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Clara
Category
Eminent Domain/Inv Cond Unlimited (14)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Eminent Domain
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT
IT RESTAURANTS, INC. FOR
E CONDEMNATION AND
DEMNATION DAMAGES
iff,
ation; and DOES 1-50,
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: Aug 05, 2020Motion: Other
Date: Aug 05, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: Aug 05, 2020Minute Order
Date: Jul 29, 2020Motion: Bifurcate
Date: Jul 14, 2020Minute Order
Date: Jun 19, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Jun 19, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 17, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 17, 2020Response/Reply
Date: Apr 23, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: Apr 14, 2020Motion: Sever/Bifurcate
Date: Feb 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: Feb 18, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: Feb 07, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Feb 07, 2020Order
Date: Feb 07, 2020Request
Date: Feb 06, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: Jan 31, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: Jan 31, 2020Brief
Date: Jan 31, 2020Minute Order
Date: Jan 21, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: Jan 21, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: Jan 08, 2020Response/Reply
Date: Jan 07, 2020Brief
Date: Jan 06, 2020Court Trial: Long Cause
Date: Jan 06, 2020Request
Date: Jan 06, 2020Motion: In Limine
Date: Jan 03, 2020Brief: Trial
Date: Jan 03, 2020Motion: In Limine
Date: Jan 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: Dec 24, 2019Hearing: Motion hearings
Date: Dec 20, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: Dec 20, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Dec 16, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Dec 16, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Dec 16, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Dec 16, 2019Request
Date: Dec 11, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Dec 11, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Dec 11, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Dec 11, 2019Motion: Other
Date: Dec 04, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Nov 27, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: Nov 26, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Nov 26, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: Nov 12, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Oct 31, 2019Minute Order
Date: Oct 31, 2019Motion: Order
Date: Oct 31, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Oct 21, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 21, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 16, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Oct 16, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Oct 16, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Oct 16, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Oct 16, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: Oct 16, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Sep 13, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Sep 13, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Sep 13, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Sep 13, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: Sep 13, 2019Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: Aug 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: Aug 20, 2019Hearing: Motion to Strike
Date: Aug 20, 2019Response/Reply
Date: Aug 13, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: Aug 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: Aug 07, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: Aug 06, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: Aug 06, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: Jul 29, 2019Motion: Order
Date: Jul 29, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Jul 09, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: Jun 18, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: Jun 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: Apr 16, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: Apr 16, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: Apr 10, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: Apr 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 02, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: Mar 11, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: Jan 02, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Plt's Motion to Bifurcate Def's crossclaim is Denied without prejudice by Judge Manoukian |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other RE: Assignment to Judge for Purposes of Trial; TBD by court |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support F. Gale Connor |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Notice of Change of Address |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
Motion: Bifurcate
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 19, 2020 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement of Defendant |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply HRG 4/30/20 - City of Santa Clara's Reply in Support of Motion for Order Bifurcating Trial of Cross-Action |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Motion to Bifurcate |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Sever/Bifurcate 04/30/20 9AM D. 20 atty Connor Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Bifurcating Trial of Cross-Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 07, 2020 | hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order re: granting motion for prejudgment possession, signed by Judge Kirwan |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: reporter Martha Ruble for 2-7-20 dept.19 - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
February 07, 2020 | hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request City's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Order After Bifurcated Trial on Defendant D.E. II Restaurants, Inc.'s Objections to Right to Take- Signed by Judge Lie |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Motion for Possession |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Evidence |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Supplemental Brief iso Motion for Prejudgment Possession |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of FGC Supplemental Brief iso Motion for Prejudgment Possession | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Scott Jenny in Support of Opposition | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 21, 2020 | hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Cynthia C. Lie |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Motion to Conform Answer According to Proof at Trial |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply City of Santa Clara's Reply to Brief re Waiver of Objection to Right to Take Premised on Purported Predetermination |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) to Conform Answer re: Pretextual Argument |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Regarding Waiver of Pretextual Argument |
|
January 06, 2020 | hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Cynthia C. Lie |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request HRG 1/06/20 for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore- Signed by Judge Lie |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: In Limine Motion to Quash Notice to Appear at Trial |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial City of Santa Clara's Trial Brief |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: In Limine Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of A. Yu iso Motion to Quash NTA | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS City's Motion to Limit Evidence at Trial to the Certified Administrative Record is DENIED and Motion to Exclude Evidence Related to the Right to Relocation Assistance is GANTED; Def's Motion to Augment the Administrative Record is DENIED |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore HRG 12/20/19 |
|
December 20, 2019 | hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
December 20, 2019 | hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Ruth Shikada iso Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Possession |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion to Augment |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Pltf's Reply ISO Mtn to Limit Evid |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Sta Clara Cty's Oppo to Deft Req re Oral Evid |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Sta Clara Cty's Reply re Mtn to Exclude Evid |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Permission to Introduce Evidence |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Motion to Exclude Evidence |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Motion to Limit Evidence |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear at Trial |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice List of Documents for Right to Take Trial |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice List of Witnesses for Right to Take Trial |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Motions to Exclude Documents, Witnesses & to Augment Administrative Record. 12/20/19 @ 10AM, D19. Atty Jenny Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Mtn to limit evidence at right to take trial to the certified administrative record, 12/20/19, 9AM, D19, Atty Conner Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Motion to Exclude All Evidence Related to Relocation at Right to Take Trial, 12/20/19, 9AM, D19, Atty Conner Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter #3728027 - Motion hearing date for both motions are not reserved. Please call law and motion to reserve a date 408-882-2430. |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Errata RE: to Certification of Administrative Record |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of FGC iso Plaintiff City's Motion to Limit Evidence at Right to Take Trial to Certified Administrative Record |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) Plaintiff's Exhibit & Witness List |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Record Certification of Administrative Record |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: evidentary motions for right to take trial, signed by Judge Kirwan |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of F. Gale Conner Re: Notice of Ex Parte Appearance |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Re:12/20/19 Evidentiary Motion for Right to Take Trial |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
October 31, 2019 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2019 | hearing |
Motion: Order
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Evidence in Reply Brief |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support OF F. GALE CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support OF RUTH SHIKADA IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice CITY OF SANTA CLARA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of Robert Swenson |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Evidence |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Motion for Possession |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of Scott Jenny |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of David Ebrahimi |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer: Cross Complaint TO CROSS COMPLAINT |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 20, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing: Motion to Strike
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint is DENIED |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Hrg 08/20/19 - to Motion to Strike Cross Complaint |
|
August 06, 2019 | hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Hrg 08/20/19 - of Scott Jenny in Support of Opposition |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Hrg. 10/31/19 - in Support of Motion for Prejudgment Possession & Authorities |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion: Order for prejudgment possession - Hrg. 10/31/19 @ 9am D19 Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Hrg. 10/31/19 - of R. Shikada in Support of Motion for Prejudgment Possession |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Hrg. 10/31/19 - of F. Gale Connor in Support of Motion for Prejudgment Possession |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Hrg. 10/31/19 - of R Zeigler in Support of Motion for Prejudgment Possession |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement (re: 8.6.19 CMC) |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities HRG 08/20/19 - in Support of Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint - HRG 08/20/19 @ 9am D19 Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration HRG 08/20/19 - of F. Gale Connor in Support of Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter env #02970080- Per code cited for exemption of fees on the documents, you must select waiver as a payment option. |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 16, 2019 | hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 Paid |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to First Amended Complaint, Atty Jenny |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint re: Inverse Condemnation and Precondemnation Damages, atty Jenny |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 4/16/19 Case Management Statement |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Since the party is represented by an attorney, the fees must be submitted electornically |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 04-16-2019 Case Management Statement |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee 1st amended, Atty Connor |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement/Receipt | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion of Probable Just Compensation (CCP 1255.020) |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Deposit of Probable Amount of Compensation (CCP 1255.020) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |