Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Arturo Reyes, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Azad M Marvazy, against Ivary Management Company, represented by Julie Anne Marquis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Brian C. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: January 02, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: May 10, 2019Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: January 04, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 10, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: June 17, 2020Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: July 10, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: May 30, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: July 14, 2020Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: June 17, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: May 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
This is a putative class and Private Attorneys General Act (“PAGA”) action on behalf of employees of defendant Ivary Management Co. dba Renaissance Stone Care & Waterproofing, alleging a number of wag...
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
October 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Final Fairness Hearing
Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Order After Hearing on 7/10/20 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class/PAGA Settlement - signed/BCW |
|
July 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
This is a putative class and Private Attorneys General Act (“PAGA”) action on behalf of employees of defendant Ivary Management Co. dba Renaissance Stone Care & Waterproofing, alleging a number of wag...
Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Preliminary Approval
Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALIREZA ALIVANDIVAFA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS??? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Tentative Ruling HRG 7/10/20 |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed [PROPOSED] ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING CLASS AND GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Preliminary Approval Motion: Preliminary Approval HRG 7/10/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.