Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dipiero, Anthony, against Jones, Samantha, represented by Apps, Stanley R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions179 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement - Jurisdiction Retained-CCP 664.6,Filed | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10,000, Filed | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.