Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pace Supply Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hatcher, William W, Jr, against Villa Musica Llc, I5 Plumbing Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Pendency of Action, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.