Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saucedo, Sylvia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mckiernan, James, against Santa Maria Public Airport District, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management237 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, Filed | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, Filed | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint PI/PD/WD Non Motor Vehicle, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.