Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cervantes, Ernesto, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beardsley, Alan J, Kaestner, Jan Eric, Liggett, Bradley D, against Al Saud, Mohammad Bin Fahd, Estate Of Susan Carol Mcknight, Mcknight, Estate Of Susan Carol, represented by Wahl, Jessica N, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management199 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Ernesto Cervantes against Mohammad Bin Fahd Al Saud and the Estate of Susan Carol McKnight. The complaint alleges that the defendants were negligent and that their...
91003REQUE000df4
Date: January 30, 202453305CaseM00864e
Date: February 10, 2022E Cervantes 2.24.22 CMC Statement
Date: February 25, 202261151MEMOR03c8ea
Date: July 29, 202261151DECLA02d682
Date: July 29, 202261151DEFEN00acb6
Date: July 29, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Complaint PI/PD/WD Motor Vehicle, Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 08, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2022Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: July 29, 2022267099_POS_2
Date: August 05, 202263074NOTIC0022de
Date: September 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Lien, Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: May 15, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 22, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: August 29, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: September 07, 2022Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Association of Attorney/Counsel, Filed
Date: August 01, 202268648PROOF024fe4
Date: January 03, 202368774Proof02d653
Date: January 05, 2023Cervantes_E_Notice_of_Settlement
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | 91003REQUE000df4 | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Cervantes_E_Notice_of_Settlement | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 68774Proof02d653 | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 68648PROOF024fe4 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 63074NOTIC0022de | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
63074NOTICEOF0041bc9 Notice, Filed - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT MOHAMMAD BIN FAHD AL SAUD/S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.